+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Insurance
- Reptd Fav
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 58
- 58-3-192
+ − Vote
April 20, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor