+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-98
- Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/6/2013
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2013
- Reptd Fav
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Commerce
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Business and Labor
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
April 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9