+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Serial Referral To Judiciary Stricken
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 30, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor