+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Tabled A3
- Amend Failed A2
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Tabled A1
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A1
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 02/10/2015
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 02/05/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (8)
June 28, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 1
June 28, 2016: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 2
June 28, 2016: Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 1
June 27, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 1
June 27, 2016: Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2015: A1 Pittman Third Reading
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 108
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor