+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 02/27/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2019: Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor