+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 02/16/2017
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
February 16, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor