+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Environment
- Ordered Engrossed
- Reptd Fav Com Sub Amend
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Serial Referral order has been changed
- Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Energy and Emerging Markets
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Public Utilities and Energy
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor