+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 5/29/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-41
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/22/2015
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 03/25/2015
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 7B
- 7B-3102
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
March 25, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5