+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2014-8
- Ratified
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Failed A3
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Reconsidered Concurrence
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Business and Labor
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
- Reptd Fav
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Biotechnology and Health Care
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
+ − Votes (9)
June 12, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 12, 2014: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 12, 2014: M6 Reconsider
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
June 12, 2014: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
June 12, 2014: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 12, 2014: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 11, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 1
June 11, 2014: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 1
June 27, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor