+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2013-181
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/10/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
June 25, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7