+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-146
- Signed by Gov. 7/13/2015
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/6/2015
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/01/2015
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/24/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/23/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Insurance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Insurance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
+ − Votes (4)
July 1, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
June 24, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 24, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 15, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 5