+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2016-78
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2016
- Ratified
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Insurance
- Withdrawn From Com
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/10/2015
- Withdrawn From Com
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Reptd Fav
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Insurance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (55)
- 20 -
- 58 -
- 20-309 -
- 58-3-50 -
- 58-36-43 -
- 58-5-55 -
- 58-50-40 -
- 58-50-82 -
- 58-6-25 -
- 58-64-80 -
- 58-89A-60 -
- 105 -
- 105-153.5 -
- 15A-1340.37 -
- 58-10-340 -
- 58-10-345 -
- 58-10-347 -
- 58-10-350 -
- 58-10-355 -
- 58-10-370 -
- 58-10-380 -
- 58-10-390 -
- 58-10-395 -
- 58-10-400 -
- 58-10-405 -
- 58-10-415 -
- 58-10-420 -
- 58-10-430 -
- 58-10-435 -
- 58-10-440 -
- 58-10-470 -
- 58-10-496 -
- 58-10-505 -
- 58-10-510 -
- 58-10-515 -
- 58-10-525 -
- 58-10-550 -
- 58-10-565 -
- 58-10-585 -
- 58-10-625 -
- 58-2-164 -
- 58-3-7 -
- 58-36-10 -
- 58-36-15 -
- 58-36-30 -
- 58-36-75 -
- 58-36-87 -
- 58-37-1 -
- 58-51-95 -
- 58-56A-10 -
- 58-70-10 -
- 58-87-1 -
- 58-87-5 -
- 58-92-20 -
- 15A -
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
June 22, 2016: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
June 22, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
August 10, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10