+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Education - K-12
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Education - K-12
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 115C -
- 115C-218.75 -
- 115C-375.10 -
- 115C-238.66 -
- 115C-5 -
- 116-239.8 -
- 116 -
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2017: A1 Blackwell Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor