+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Health Care
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 03/28/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 90-648
- 90-652
- 90-653
- 90-654
- 90-656
- 90-659
- 90-660
- 90-661
- 90-664
+ − Vote
March 28, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor