+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-22
- Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Special Message Received From House
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 105
- Absent: 15
June 13, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor