+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/17/2017
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Appropriations
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (37)
- 5A -
- 7A -
- 7B -
- 14 -
- 17C -
- 17E -
- 115C -
- 143B -
- 115C-404 -
- 14-208.6B -
- 14-316.1 -
- 143B-805 -
- 143B-806 -
- 17C-6 -
- 17E-4 -
- 5A-31 -
- 5A-34 -
- 7A-343 -
- 7B-1501 -
- 7B-1601 -
- 7B-1604 -
- 7B-1703 -
- 7B-1704 -
- 7B-1705 -
- 7B-2200 -
- 7B-2200.5 -
- 7B-2202 -
- 7B-2506 -
- 7B-2507 -
- 7B-2513 -
- 7B-2515 -
- 7B-2603 -
- 7B-3001 -
- 7B-3101 -
- 7B-1702 -
- 7B-2508 -
- 7B-2508.1 -
+ − Vote
May 17, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor