+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 136
- 136-18.06
+ − Vote
March 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor