+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-121
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/11/2013
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2013
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Environmental
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (3)
June 7, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 18
June 4, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 25, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor