+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
- Ch. SL 2018-24
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/28/2017
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/27/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 03/23/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Health
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 15
June 13, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
March 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor