+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9
June 7, 2018: Third Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor