+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2015-254
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Added to Calendar
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 09/28/2015
On September 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On September 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 20
- 20-79.4
- 20-79.7
- 20-81.12
- 13A-255
- 143-151.9
- 143B-472.128
- 159G-70
+ − Votes (6)
September 28, 2015: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 10
September 28, 2015: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
September 28, 2015: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
September 24, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
September 24, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
September 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor