+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-21
- Ratified
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/20/2013
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
March 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor