+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 29, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-364
- Signed by Gov. 7/29/2013
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2013
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 22, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On July 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/22/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On July 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
On July 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013
- Ordered Engrossed
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amendment Ruled Out of Order 3
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A4
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Added
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 105 -
- 115C -
- 105-151.33 -
- 105-160.3 -
- 105-259 -
- 115C-112.2 -
- 115C-112.3 -
- 115C-112.4 -
- 115C-112.5 -
+ − Votes (7)
July 22, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
July 18, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 8
May 15, 2013: A2 Brandon Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: A4 Hamilton Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 70
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 37
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: A1 Stam Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor