+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
+ − Votes (2)
August 4, 2015: A1 Goodman Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
August 4, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor