+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law
- Reptd Fav
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 115C-37.1