+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-281
- Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2013
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/09/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Held in Senate Clerk's Office
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/20/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
July 9, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
July 1, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
March 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor