+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-325
- Signed by Gov. 7/23/2013
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2013
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Conf Report Adopted
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/11/2013
- Conf Com Reported
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/11/2013
- Conf Com Reported
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/20/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (5)
July 11, 2013: C RPT Adopted
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
July 11, 2013: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 17, 2013: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
June 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor