+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/13/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-145
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/6/2015
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/01/2015
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A2
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/01/2015
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (23)
+ − Votes (9)
July 1, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
June 25, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
June 25, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 25, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
June 25, 2015: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
April 14, 2015: A1 Arp Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
April 14, 2015: A3 Saine Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
April 14, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
April 14, 2015: A2 Brody Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor