+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-130
- Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
- Ratified
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 143
- 153A
- 160A
- 143-136
- 143-140
- 143-355.4
- 153A-352
- 160A-412
- 60A-412
- 143-138
+ − Votes (5)
June 28, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
March 29, 2017: A1 Arp Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
March 29, 2017: A2 Faircloth Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor