+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-95
- Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/7/2013
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 02/12/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 14 -
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
February 12, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor