+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-240
- Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2013
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/20/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Serial Referral To Finance Stricken
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 115C -
- 115C-302.1 -
+ − Votes (2)
June 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
March 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor