+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-200
- Signed by Gov. 6/26/2013
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2013
- Ratified
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur In S Amend 1
- Rec From Senate
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav As Amended
- Com Amend Adopted 1
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/18/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2013: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
June 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
April 18, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor