+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-103
- Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Health
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 131D
- 131E
- 143B
- 120-208.2
- 131D-31
- 131E-128
- 143B-181.18
- 108C-3
- 108C
+ − Votes (5)
June 29, 2017: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 113
- Absent: 7
June 29, 2017: Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
June 28, 2017: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor