+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/15/2015
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 105-539
- 105-540
- 105-541
- 105-542
- 105-543
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
June 15, 2015: A1 Goodman Second Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
June 15, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10