+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Agriculture Stricken
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Agriculture Added
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Environment
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Environment
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 130A
- 130A-294
- 130A-309.11
+ − Vote
April 20, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor