+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/29/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-74
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A3
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- 90 -
- 58-51-56 -
- 90-106 -
- 90-106.3 -
- 90-113.27 -
- 90-113.72 -
- 90-113.73 -
- 90-113.74 -
- 90-113.74A -
- 90-113.74B -
- 90-113.74C -
- 90-113.75A -
- 90-113.75B -
- 90-113.75C -
- 90-12.7 -
- 90-18.1 -
- 90-18.2 -
- 58 -
- 90-113.74D -
- 90-87 -
+ − Votes (7)
June 27, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
June 21, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
June 21, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
April 10, 2017: A1 Murphy Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
April 10, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Absent: 6
April 10, 2017: A2 Adcock Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
April 10, 2017: A3 Adcock Second Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 74
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor