+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2015-15
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 158-8 -
+ − Vote
March 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor