+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A1
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/09/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 7A
- 7A-45.1
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2017: A1 Jackson Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 69
- Absent: 6
March 9, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 47
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor