+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Failed 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/16/2015
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 15
- 15-11.1
+ − Vote
April 16, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 63
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor