+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/09/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Elections and Ethics Law
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 7A
- 7A-142
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2017: A1 Stevens Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
March 9, 2017: A2 Reives Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 70
- Absent: 6
March 9, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor