+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Veto Overridden
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-7
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Received from House
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
- Received from the Governor
- Vetoed 04/20/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 4/11/2017
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/09/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 7A
- 7A-16
- 7A-27
- 7A-31
- 7B
- 7B-1001
+ − Votes (8)
April 26, 2017: Veto Override
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: Motion 11 Veto Override
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 1
April 11, 2017: M8 Re-Refer Judiciary I
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 69
- Absent: 7
April 11, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 7
April 11, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 7
April 10, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 5
March 9, 2017: M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Operations of the House Second Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 71
- Absent: 6
March 9, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 6