+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/2/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-46
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/27/2015
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S Amend SA2
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/21/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Failed A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/15/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 115C
- 115C-105.41
- 115C-83.7
- 115C-83.9
+ − Votes (7)
May 21, 2015: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 2
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 4
May 14, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 2
May 14, 2015: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 14, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
April 15, 2015: A2 Richardson Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
April 15, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
April 15, 2015: A1 Cotham Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor