+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 21, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-158
- Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
- Ratified
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Reconsidered Concurrence
- Conf Com Dismissed
- Added to Calendar
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Reconsidered 3rd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To State and Local Government II Added
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (44)
- 1
- 1A
- 5A
- 7A
- 7B
- 14
- 15A
- 28A
- 30
- 35A
- 58
- 84
- 122C
- 1-110
- 122C-264
- 122C-268
- 14-208.12A
- 15A-305
- 1A-1
- 28A-20-1
- 28A-21-1
- 28A-21-2
- 28A-9-2
- 30-17
- 35A-1112
- 35A-1114
- 35A-1290
- 58-76-15
- 58-76-25
- 5A-23
- 7A-307
- 7A-343
- 7A-64
- 7B-2901
- 7B-3000
- 7B-603
- 84-2
- 132-1.10
- 7A-38.1
- 7A-38.2
- 7A-38.3B
- 7A-38.3D
- 7A-38.4A
- 132
+ − Votes (8)
June 28, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
June 28, 2017: M6 Reconsider
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2017: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
June 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 26, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2017: A1 Turner, R. Third Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: M6 Reconsider Third Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor