+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/16/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
March 16, 2017: A1 Graham, C. Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor