+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/3/2019
- Ch. SL 2019-19
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/30/2019
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/28/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 05/21/2019
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2019: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
May 21, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4