+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On July 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/22/2021
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Environment
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 22, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor