+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2014-5
- Signed by Gov. 6/10/2014
- Pres. To Gov. 6/10/2014
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Postponed To 06/05/2014
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2014
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A1
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Placed On Cal For 05/29/2014
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/20/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 115C -
- 115C-563 -
- 115C-174.12 -
- 115C-174.26. -
- 115C-238.29F -
- 115C-83.11 -
- 115C-83.15 -
- 115C-83.3 -
- 115C-83.4A -
- 115C-83.5 -
- 115C-83.7 -
- 115C-83.8 -
- 115C-83.9 -
+ − Votes (4)
June 5, 2014: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
May 29, 2014: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 5
May 29, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
March 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor