+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- 39
- 41
- 39-13.3
- 39-13.6
- 39-13.7
- 41-2
- 41-2.5
- 29
- 52
- 29-30
- 39-13
- 39-13.2
- 39-13.4
- 39-13.5
- 39-7
- 39-8
- 39-9
- 41-10
- 52-10
- 52-10.1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor