+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-101
- Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017
- Reptd Fav
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 15A
- 15A-301.1
+ − Votes (2)
June 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 20, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor