+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/11/2021
- Ch. SL 2021-31
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/8/2021
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 06/03/2021
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/24/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
March 24, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor